Trustees HARROW CLUB
Charity number: 1054757

Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Rowland Benson Mr | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lynne Guyton | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Jean Mary Oxley | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander James Trotter | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Rossan | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leanda Fauset | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Micah Watkis | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mr Tim Dalton | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Kate Walker | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mr Philippe Chappatte | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN MARTIN | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS RICHARD MALCOLM STODDART-SCOTT | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|||||
KEVIN W B GILBERT FCA | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.