EDEN VALLEY RAILWAY TRUST

Charity number: 1054760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 January 2020 340 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 May 2018 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 May 2018 479 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required