BURNLEY YOUTH THEATRE

Charity number: 1054763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Goulding Trustee 02 December 2021 None on record
Holly Clarke Trustee 02 December 2021 None on record
STEPHEN LESLIE COOK Trustee None on record
Awais Javid Trustee 02 December 2021 None on record
Afrasiab Anwar Trustee 30 October 2018
CLARETS IN THE COMMUNITY LIMITED Received: On time
BUILDING BRIDGES IN BURNLEY Received: On time
LANCASHIRE COUNCIL OF MOSQUES Received: On time
Peter Kenyon Trustee
BURNLEY PENDLE AND ROSSENDALE COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE Received: On time
SMILE MEDIATION LTD Received: On time
Lisa Dixon Trustee 14 December 2019 None on record
Victoria Holliday Trustee 02 December 2021 None on record
SARA MARTIN Trustee 20 September 2013 None on record
Joseph Shaw Trustee 21 September 2021 None on record
Debs Ashby Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
KELLY ALLEN Trustee 20 September 2013 None on record
Anthony Preston Trustee 08 April 2020 None on record
RACHEL JANE LIVERMORE Trustee 19 May 2016 None on record