CATCOTE SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS

Charity number: 1054871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 05 October 2021 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 06 January 2020 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 18 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 10 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required