CATCOTE SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS

Charity number: 1054871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £3.68k £1.36k £3.32k £17.23k £4.47k
Total expenditure £1.12k £9.51k £3.42k £14.69k £8.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A