CATCOTE SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS

Charity number: 1054871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ruth Christian Trustee 07 October 2021 None on record
Wendy Apedaile Trustee 07 October 2021 None on record
Lisa Relton Trustee 06 January 2020 None on record
Amanda Metcalf Chair 10 June 2014 None on record
Danielle Coulton Trustee 01 March 2018 None on record
Barry Currell Trustee 01 March 2018 None on record
Alan Pounder Trustee 12 March 2015 None on record
Jodie Crosby Trustee 07 October 2021 None on record
Helen Newton Trustee 07 October 2021 None on record
Claire Landreth Trustee 07 October 2021 None on record