DERBYSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1053329-16
Linked charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21/03/1996 AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 01/04/2001 AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 01/04/2002 AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 20/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30/07/2012
Charitable objects
FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES RELATING TO THE GENERAL OR ANY SPECIFIC PURPOSES OF THE DERBYSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST OR FOR ANY PURPOSES RELATING TO THE HEALTH SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 25 April 1996: Standard registration
Other names
  • DERBYSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST (Previous name)
  • DERBYSHIRE MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES NHS TRUST GENERAL CHARITY (Previous name)
  • SOUTHERN DERBYSHIRE COMMUNITY AND MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES NHS TRUST GENERAL CHARITY (Previous name)
  • SOUTHERN DERBYSHIRE MENTAL HEALTH NHS TRUST GENERAL CHARITY (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of