ATTLEBOROUGH DAY CENTRE

Charity number: 1054909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £113.99k £177.67k £180.87k £165.88k £131.70k
Total expenditure £117.36k £130.75k £158.96k £158.83k £147.69k
Income from government contracts £74.18k £96.10k £104.03k £100.01k £76.97k
Income from government grants £1.00k £500 N/A £2.86k N/A