THE DEVON AND DORSET MILITARY MUSEUMS CHARITY

Charity number: 1054956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

On 31 March 2023, the Charity transferred responsibility for governing The Keep Military Museum to The Dorchester Keep Military Museum Trust (1200607)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021

Total income: £137,070
Total expenditure: £87,993

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE MUSEUM CHARITY (Working name)
  • THE DEVONSHIRE AND DORSET MILITARY MUSEUMS CHARITY (Previous name)
  • THE DEVONSHIRE AND DORSET REGIMENTAL MUSEUMS CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Brigadier Richard H D Toomey CBE DL Chair 17 June 2016
THE SOMERSET MILITARY MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID JAMES LORD SWANN Trustee 06 October 2022
DORSET YOUTH ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE DORCHESTER KEEP MILITARY MUSEUM TRUST
Recently registered
THE ROYAL ARMOURED CORPS MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
Philip Ashley Cooper Trustee 06 October 2022
THE DORCHESTER KEEP MILITARY MUSEUM TRUST
Recently registered
Michael Worthy Kinney Trustee 06 October 2022
THE DORCHESTER KEEP MILITARY MUSEUM TRUST
Recently registered
Captain Colin Albert Parr MBE Trustee 15 April 2021
THE DORSET ARMY CADET LEAGUE
Received: On time
David Francis Herbert Jones Trustee 01 January 2020
THE DORCHESTER KEEP MILITARY MUSEUM TRUST
Recently registered
THE VICTORIA CROSS AND GEORGE CROSS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
VICTORIA JANE DE WIT Trustee 16 October 2018
THE DORCHESTER KEEP MILITARY MUSEUM TRUST
Recently registered
LT COL MARK CLEMENT GIDLOW-JACKSON MBE Trustee 16 October 2018
None on record
KATHERINE ANNE HAMILTON-BAILY Trustee 16 October 2018
None on record
CAPTAIN JEREMY MICHAEL ARCHER MA Trustee 01 January 2004
THE DORCHESTER KEEP MILITARY MUSEUM TRUST
Recently registered
ROYAL COMMONWEALTH EX-SERVICES LEAGUE
Received: On time
THE DEVONSHIRE AND DORSET REGIMENTAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE NOT FORGOTTEN ASSOCIATION (NFA)
Received: On time
THE RIFLES OFFICERS' FUND
Received: On time
THE RIFLES REGIMENTAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE RIFLES BENEVOLENT TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £83.11k £110.94k £108.79k £102.53k £137.07k
Total expenditure £92.82k £104.21k £103.91k £82.77k £87.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £6.70k £500 £11.77k £38.21k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE KEEP MILITARY MUSEUM
BARRACK ROAD
DORCHESTER
DT11RN
Phone:
01305264066