THE MARY FRANCES TRUST

Charity number: 1055113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £432.11k £597.09k £797.90k £731.13k £899.05k
Total expenditure £427.23k £558.28k £600.94k £681.14k £743.21k
Income from government contracts £216.22k £540.62k N/A £589.39k £758.89k
Income from government grants £149.43k £0 £539.32k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £12.23k £136.77k £26.77k £14.90k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £17.06k £0 £1.74k £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £565.74k £630.60k £697.56k £878.76k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £2.06k £3.36k £5.06k £3.38k
Income - Other N/A £0 £27.17k £0 £2.01k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £553.64k £598.95k £667.23k £741.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £4.64k £1.98k £13.91k £1.42k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £3.74k £3.98k £10.66k £3.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0