THE MARY FRANCES TRUST

Charity number: 1055113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeremy Ross Trustee 10 November 2015
KALEIDOSCOPE PROJECT Received: On time
Fergus Thomson Addison Trustee 26 April 2019 None on record
Susan Margaret Grant Trustee 06 July 2017 None on record
Samantha Greenhouse Chair 16 November 2017 None on record
HEATHER WARD Trustee None on record
Paul Matthews Trustee 15 May 2018 None on record
Claire Nethersole Trustee 16 November 2020 None on record