AURORA METRO ARTS AND MEDIA LTD

Charity number: 1055116
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 February 2019 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 June 2017 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 09 November 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)