Financial history AURORA METRO ARTS AND MEDIA LTD

Charity number: 1055116
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.00k £2.17k £10.99k £1.91k £28.44k
Total expenditure £1.39k £66 £3.03k £418 £1.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A