AURORA METRO ARTS AND MEDIA LTD

Charity number: 1055116
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHERYL ROBSON Trustee 05 April 2014 None on record
SARAH STRUPINSKI Trustee 22 February 2013 None on record
Krishnan Subramanyan Trustee 01 March 2020 None on record
Louise Maria Clare Tucker Trustee 02 December 2020 None on record
Saskia Calliste Trustee 21 August 2020 None on record
CHARLOTTE CLAIRE ROBSON Trustee None on record
Marina Isabelle TUFFIER Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record