Accounts and annual returns EDUCATION OTHERWISE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1055120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 24 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 24 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 15 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 27 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 27 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 15 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 15 April 2019 On time
Annual return 30 June 2017 19 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 19 February 2018 On time