Trustees EDUCATION OTHERWISE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1055120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FE MUKWAMBA-SENDALL Chair 01 December 2012
None on record
Ruth March Trustee 24 September 2021
None on record
Catherine Boardman Trustee 11 August 2021
None on record
Gabriella Rook Trustee 11 August 2021
None on record
Nektaria Papanicola Trustee 11 August 2021
None on record
Rebecca Silverwood Trustee 11 August 2021
None on record
John Yates Trustee 11 August 2021
None on record
Helena wilson Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Dr Ambroz Uriah Neil Trustee 25 November 2019
None on record
Wendy Charles-Warner Trustee 25 November 2019
None on record