ACE OF CLUBS (CLAPHAM)

Charity number: 1055187
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 30 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 04 July 2019 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 04 July 2019 34 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 30 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 19 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 19 April 2017 On time Download