THE FRIENDS OF ESSEX HOUSE MEDICAL CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAISING FUNDS TO PURCHASE MEDICAL EQUIPMENT ON BEHALF OF ESSEX HOUSE MEDICAL CENTRE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 09 May 1996: Standard registration
- 20 July 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.12k | £1.23k | £2.92k | £2.25k | £5.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.33k | £3.44k | £2.97k | £2.59k | £1.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED25 APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONGST PERSONS RESIDING OR TEMPORARILY RESIDING IN THE AREA COVERED BY ESSEX HOUSE MEDICAL CENTRE, CHARD
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE ESSEX HOUSE MEDICAL CENTRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window