Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF SACRED HEART SCHOOL

Charity number: 1055256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 08 May 2022 282 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 May 2022 647 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 08 January 2019 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 03 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required