Financial history FRIENDS OF SACRED HEART SCHOOL

Charity number: 1055256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £11.95k £14.12k £13.12k £9.90k £7.48k
Total expenditure £13.65k £16.53k £8.23k £7.47k £10.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A