EAST LONDON CABBIES OUTING FOR SPECIAL NEEDS CHILDREN

Charity number: 1055257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 23 March 2021 296 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 September 2019 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 25 June 2018 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 25 June 2018 390 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required