THE SHOWROOM GALLERY LTD.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is established to advance public education by the provision of an art gallery for the exhibition of contemporary art, including performance, video, installation, and artist commissions involving local participation. It is also involved in the formulation, preparation and establishment of schemes, provided that all the objectives of the charity shall be of a charitable nature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £140,247 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 10 May 1996: Standard registration
- THE SHOWROOM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zain Mahmood | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Thomas Ernest Francis | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Robert Higgs | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Andrew Evans | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Lachowsky | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alia Al-Senussi | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Mercedes Vilardell | Trustee | 19 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Andrew Mark Howson Bell | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW RENTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £334.48k | £343.04k | £379.78k | £293.45k | £266.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £383.35k | £275.76k | £316.91k | £372.83k | £342.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £8.80k | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £139.39k | £257.71k | £217.10k | £131.17k | £140.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2ND MAY 1996 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 6TH OCTOBER 2008.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ART GALLERY FOR EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC OF MODERN ART, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF PAINTING, SCULPTURE, PERFORMANCE, VIDEO, INSTALLATION, AND THE FORMULATION, PREPARATION AND ESTABLISHMENT OF SCHEMES THEREFOR PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SHOWROOM
63 PENFOLD STREET
LONDON
NW8 8PQ
- Phone:
- 02077244300
- Email:
- info@theshowroom.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window