Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST. GILES PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1055283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 July 2023 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 July 2023 379 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 April 2021 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 14 January 2020 198 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1749 days