THE COMMUNITY OF AIDAN AND HILDA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian religion, in particular: - to develop an international ecumenical Christian community with a shared way of life - the resourcing of houses of prayer and hospitality - to promote research, education and resourcing of the existing and emerging church - to encourage spiritual growth through pilgrimage, retreats and provision of resources for worship and prayer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Denmark
- France
- Germany
- Ireland
- New Zealand
- Norway
- Scotland
- South Africa
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 16 May 1996: Standard registration
- CAOH (Working name)
- COMMUNITY OF AIDAN AND HILDA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Johnston Holt | Chair |
|
||||||||||||||||||
Rev Carol Smith | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Dr Lars Jacob Stray Knutsen | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Rev RUTH VAUGHAN STOCK | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Rev JANET CHRISTINE BISSEX | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.57k | £68.96k | £116.40k | £71.58k | £104.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.82k | £52.94k | £116.17k | £70.75k | £100.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITABLE TRUST DATED 22 APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION,IN PARTICULAR CONCERNING THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AS IT RELATES TO THE CELTIC CHURCH AND SAINTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
137 NEWTON ROAD
SPARKHILL
BIRMINGHAM
B11 4PU
- Phone:
- 01217736063
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window