Financial history COUNCIL FOR BRITISH ARCHAEOLOGY SOUTH MIDLANDS GROUP

Charity number: 1055418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.44k £4.79k £5.60k £3.74k £3.67k
Total expenditure £3.59k £6.01k £4.89k £2.69k £583
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A