CAMELFORD YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1055460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £14.01k £9.45k £16.01k £15.56k £8.74k
Total expenditure £12.45k £11.97k £16.76k £19.36k £6.76k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A