Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF BURSTON CHURCH

Charity number: 1055487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 March 2021 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 July 2019 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required