FAIRVIEW TENANTS AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1055501
Charity reporting is overdue by 1808 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 347 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 347 days
Annual return 04 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 713 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 713 days
Annual return 04 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1078 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1078 days
Annual return 04 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1443 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1443 days
Annual return 04 April 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1808 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1808 days