Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S HERRIARD

Charity number: 1055521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required