Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S HERRIARD

Charity number: 1055521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £12.45k £22.32k £1.84k £3.77k £1.76k
Total expenditure £0 £6.41k £0 £675 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A