Accounts and annual returns 1ST CAMBORNE (ROSKEAR) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1055740
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 March 2022 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2021 284 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 December 2019 310 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required