CYLCH MEITHRIN MORFA NEFYN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre school education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 06 June 1996: Standard registration
- 28 March 2025: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.78k | £21.93k | £23.23k | £11.71k | £8.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.57k | £19.08k | £20.99k | £13.37k | £11.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.42k | £11.72k | £16.66k | £8.90k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CYFANSODDIAD Y CYLCH YN AMGAEEDIG DERBYNIWYD GAN Y PWYLLGOR AR 31 JANUARY 1996 CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 JANUARY 1996
Charitable objects
AMCANION Y GYMDEITHAS YW HYRWYDDO ADDYSG PLANT DAN OED YSGOL YN MORFA NEFYN TRWY GYFRWNG YR IAITH GYMRAEG TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN IN MORFA NEFYN THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE WELSH LANGUAGE
Area of benefit
MORFA NEFYN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window