Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL HOSPITAL OF ST. BARTHOLOMEW CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1055845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 March 2022 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 February 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 February 2021 381 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required