Financial history THE ROYAL HOSPITAL OF ST. BARTHOLOMEW CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1055845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £114 £68 £185 £272 £35
Total expenditure £373 £290 £437 £480 £480
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A