Accounts and annual returns LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND PROFICIENCY TESTS COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1055868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required