Financial history LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND PROFICIENCY TESTS COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1055868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £195 £90 £106 £122 £32
Total expenditure £5.84k £5.18k £5.58k £5.45k £5.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A