Trustees THE WYE RURAL MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 1055879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr JOHN NIGHTINGALE Chair
THE MAGDALEN COLLEGE DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE CROMARTY TRUST
Received: On time
MURSTON ALL SAINTS TRUST
Received: On time
THE JUSTINIAN BRACEGIRDLE EXHIBITION FOUNDATION
Overdue by 1332 days
THE COLLEGE OF ST MARY MAGDALEN IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Received: On time
THE NIGHTINGALE TRUST
Received: On time
THE NORTH DOWNS SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE HILL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Michael James West Trustee 10 October 2022
None on record
Timothy Betts Trustee 06 July 2020
None on record
FRANCIS PETER HETHERSETT HUNTINGTON Trustee 18 June 2016
HEAL FOR LIFE FOUNDATION UK
Received: On time
WYE HERITAGE
Received: On time
Dr John Bulaitis Trustee 05 October 2015
None on record
Dr Graham Bradley Trustee 15 January 2014
None on record
THE RT HON SIR JOHN FRANK MUMMERY BCLHON LLD Trustee
None on record
Dr JEREMY CLARKE Trustee
None on record
Sir George Jessel DL Trustee
None on record
Dr Sheila Mary Sweetinburgh BA MA PhD Trustee
THE OXUS FOUNDATION
Recently registered
PROFESSOR PAUL WEBSTER Trustee
None on record