Accounts and annual returns ST AUGUSTINE OF CANTERBURY PTFA

Charity number: 1055884
Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 91 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 91 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 August 2021 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 March 2021 267 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 December 2019 183 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 October 2018 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required