NELSON MANDELA CHILDREN'S FUND (UK)

Charity number: 1055899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 August 2017 On time Download