NELSON MANDELA CHILDREN'S FUND (UK)

Charity number: 1055899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £231.71k £125.97k £160.14k £223.68k £265.13k
Total expenditure £329.15k £208.50k £152.09k £246.27k £227.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £6.00k