Financial history THE ASSOCIATION OF MIRPUR WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 1055904
Charity reporting is overdue by 1637 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.90k £46.42k £2.91k £1.92k £2.85k
Total expenditure £4.43k £8.41k £3.67k £1.78k £43.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A