THE OLD AND NEW TESTAMENT CHURCH OF GOD

Charity Number: 1055920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The church supports the local community by having conventions, open days and regular worship.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £18,500
Total expenditure: £3,449

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Blaenau Gwent
  • Bridgend
  • Caerphilly
  • Cardiff
  • Merthyr Tydfil
  • Monmouthshire
  • Newport City
  • Rhondda Cynon Taff
  • Torfaen
  • Vale Of Glamorgan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 June 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MILLICENT AMBROZINE ROWE Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL PATRICK ROWE Trustee
None on record
Shirley Patricia BRYAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.76k £13.43k £12.48k £14.17k £18.50k
Total expenditure £8.83k £5.27k £3.08k £2.46k £3.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 February 2024 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FLAT 1 HOLMESDALE COURT
GRANGETOWN
CARDIFF
SOUTH WALES
CF11 7HG
Phone:
02920237976
Website:

No information available