Accounts and annual returns LIVERPOOL GREEK SOCIETY

Charity number: 1055928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required