Financial history The Beacons Recreational Centre

Charity number: 1055975
Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £19.21k £3.39k £546 £557 £2.62k
Total expenditure £17.22k £1.44k £1.62k £1.51k £2.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A