BARTHOLOMEW SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1056098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting education of students at Bartholomew School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £2,748
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 June 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • B S A (Working name)
  • BARTHOLOMEW SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicola Bexon Chair 25 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.59k £2.42k £9.80k £4.67k £2.75k
Total expenditure £6.08k £123 £722 £140 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 28 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 29 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 July 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 July 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 Oakdale Lane
WITNEY
OX28 1GH
Phone:
01993700392