DARTFORD DISTRICT ARCHAEOLOGICAL GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Archaeological research within the Dartford Borough area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
Governance
- 13 June 1996: Standard registration
- D D A G (Working name)
- DDAG (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Charles William Still | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Roy Baker | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM SCOTT MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £888 | £861 | £258 | £258 | £612 | |
|
Total expenditure | £877 | £475 | £346 | £346 | £338 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 165 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 13TH MAY 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ARCHAEOLOGY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Emersons Avenue
Hextable
Swanley
BR8 7WS
- Phone:
- 01322616424
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window