Accounts and annual returns CYLCH MEITHRIN BETHEL

Charity number: 1056176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 February 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 February 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required