Financial history THE LONDON SCOTTISH REGIMENT 1995 CHARITY

Charity number: 1056219
Charity reporting is overdue by 239 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £51.62k £38.13k £36.76k £25.62k £27.19k
Total expenditure £57.65k £159.10k £161.31k £650.60k £276.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A