Trustees ST MARGARET'S SCHOOL BUSHEY
Charity number: 1056228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Morven Jan Longton | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Robert Woolf | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Goerge Budd | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catharine Mary Jessop | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kaya Jeyarajah | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Calvey | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy O'Brien | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Miller | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yasmin Jones-Henry | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Spooner | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Floretta Hodgson | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN COULSHED | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.