Accounts and annual returns CYLCH MEITHRIN LLANILAR

Charity number: 1056233
Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 171 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 171 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window